Sharp v. Maricopa County et al

Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Sharp
Defendant: Maricopa County, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Joseph Arpaio and Correctional Health Services
Case Number: 2:2008cv02316
Filed: December 19, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and the claims are dismissed without prejudice. The action is terminated, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/10.(LSP)
February 4, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Arpaio's Motion to dismiss (Doc. #26). Arpaio's Motion to dismiss 26 is granted, and he is dismissed without prejudice from the action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/4/10.(DMT)
December 15, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla's 29 OBJECTION to Judge Irwin's 28 Report and Recommendation is denied. The findings of the magistrate judge are affirmed. Dfts' 27 Motion to Set Aside entry of default is granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/09. (SAT) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO CORRECT JUDGE'S SIGNATURE DATE FROM (12/15/09) TO (12/14/09) ON 12/16/2009 (MHU).
November 6, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Recommending that the 27 MOTION to Set Aside the Entry of Default be granted; further recommending that the default entered against Defendants Arpaio and Maricopa County on 10/2/09 24 be set side and that Defendants' Answer 25 and Motion to Dismiss 26 be deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin on 11/6/09. (REW, )
March 12, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Dfts Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Maricopa County Correctional Health Services, John Does I-X, and Black Corporations I-V are dismissed without prejudice. (Doc.# 12.) Dfts Maricopa County and Sheriff Arpaio must answe r Pla's claims for deliberate indifference to Pla's serious medical needs contained in the First Amended Complaint. (Doc.# 12.) Pla must serve Dfts Maricopa County and Sheriff Arpaio with the First Amended Complaint. Each Dft must answer th e First Amended Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within 30 days from the date the First Amended Complaint is served on it or him. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/12/09. (SAT)
January 21, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 COMPLAINT is dismissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk must enter dismissal with prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/21/09. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Maricopa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Sharp
Represented By: Gregory Allen Malkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?