Stokes v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Keith R Stokes
Respondent: Dora B Shriro, Jackson, Terry Goddard and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2008cv02362
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Graham
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 14 . Petitioner's amended petition for writ of habeas corpus 13 is denied. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. The Court has considered whether a certificate of appealability should issue under 28 U.S.C. section 2253(c) and concludes it should not. Petitioner has not "made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right." 28 U.S.C. section 2253(c)(2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/2009. (LAD)
October 30, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 13 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 10/29/09. (ESL)
March 30, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Charles L. Ryan, Interim Director of the ADOC, is substituted as Respondent for Dora B. Schriro pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Hencef orth, proceedings in this action must be in the name of Charles L. Ryan as Respondent. The Petition (Doc. #1) is dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended petition in compliance with this Order. If Petitioner fails to file an amended petition within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, the Clerk of Court must enter, without further notice to Petitioner, a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejud ice. The Clerk of Court must provide Petitioner with a current, court-approved form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Special Prisoner Deadline due by 4/30/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/09. (KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith R Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Shriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?