Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C. v. Does 1-10 Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.
Defendant: Does 1-10
Objector: Xcentric Ventures, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2008mc00093
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2009 29 MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy) - Pursuant to the stipulation under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) by appellant and appellee, it is ordered that appeal No. 09-15488 be dismissed. A copy of this order shall act as and for the mandate of this court re case number 09-15488, as to 23 Notice of Appeal filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC (Attachments: # 1 NDA)(SAT)
September 15, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE that the above-referenced matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees re stipulation 26 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/15/09. (TLJ)
September 14, 2009 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 26 Other Notice Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.. (Dybus, Donnelly)
September 14, 2009 26 STIPULATION (Joint) for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C. (Dybus, Donnelly) Modified on 9/15/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Notice) TO (Stipulation for Dismissal) (KMG).
March 16, 2009 25 Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-15488 for 23 Notice of Appeal. (SAT)
March 10, 2009 24 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 23 Notice of Appeal filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *3/6/2009*, *Complaint/Motion* *9/23/2008*, Appealed Orders *2/10/09; 11/26/08*, Appealed Judgment *None; Misc. action*. Court Reporter *None* Fee Status: *Paid on 3/6/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Maria Speth* *(Retained)* *mcs@jaburgwilk.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Donnelly A. Dybus* *(Retained)* *ddybus@buchalter.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Record) (DMT, )
March 6, 2009 23 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 16 , 22 Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002632948. (Speth, Maria) Modified on 3/9/2009 TO ADD DOCUMENT LINKAGE (DMT, )
February 10, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER re 17 MOTION to Stay re Order Granting Motion to Compel And Motion for Reconsideration by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David) filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/10/2009. (NVO)
December 19, 2008 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Stay re Order Granting Motion to Compel And Motion for Reconsideration filed by Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Strager attaching Exhibits 1-4)(Dybus, Donnelly)
December 16, 2008 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. Ecommerce Innovations shall by 12/19/2008 file a response to Xcentric Ventures' motion for reconsideration. No reply permitted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2008.(NVJ)
December 5, 2008 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 17 MOTION to Stay re Order Granting Motion to Compel And Motion for Reconsideration. (Gingras, David)
December 5, 2008 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 17 MOTION to Stay re Order Granting Motion to Compel And Motion for Reconsideration. (Gingras, David)
December 5, 2008 17 MOTION to Stay re Order Granting Motion to Compel And Motion for Reconsideration by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David)
November 26, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiff Ecommerce Innovations LLC's 1 Motion to compel compliance with subpoena is granted; Xcentric Ventures LLC shall comply with the subpoena (Dkt. #1-2 at 23-25) by 12/5/08; Xcentric Ventures LLC's 12 Motion for sanctions is denied; the Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/25/08. (REW, )
October 22, 2008 15 Notice re Filing Signature Page by Xcentric Ventures, LLC re 11 Reply (Gingras, David)
October 22, 2008 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Sanctions against Mr. Strager PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO XCENTRIC VENTURES, LLC's 11 SUR-REPLY re 1 AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.. (Dybus, Donnelly) Modified on 10/23/2008 (TLJ). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT DOCUMENT LINKAGE.
October 22, 2008 13 DECLARATION of David S. Gingras in Support of 11 Sur-Reply by Objector Xcentric Ventures, LLC. to Plaintiff's 1 Motion to Compel (SAT)
October 22, 2008 12 MOTION for Sanctions against Mr. Strager by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (same pdf as doc #11) (SAT)
October 22, 2008 11 Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's 1 MOTION to Compel by Objector Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (SAT)
October 22, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Non-Party Xcentric Ventures, LLC's 7 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re: Motion to Compel is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Dkt. #8. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/21/08.(SAT)
October 15, 2008 9 LODGED Proposed Declaration of David S. Gingras in Support of Surreply re: Motion to Compel re: 7 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: Motion to Compel. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David)
October 15, 2008 8 LODGED Proposed Proposed Surreply re: Motion to Compel re: 7 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: Motion to Compel. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David)
October 15, 2008 7 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: Motion to Compel by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Gingras, David)
October 14, 2008 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.. (Dybus, Donnelly)
October 13, 2008 5 DECLARATION in Support re 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Issued to Xcentric Ventures, LLC filed by Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.. (Dybus, Donnelly) Modified on 10/14/2008 (LAD). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM AFFIDAVIT TO DECLARATION.
October 13, 2008 4 REPLY in Support re 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Issued to Xcentric Ventures filed by Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.. (Dybus, Donnelly)
October 3, 2008 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel filed by Xcentric Ventures, L.L.C.. (Speth, Maria)
September 23, 2008 2 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/8/2008 as to Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C. (REK)
September 23, 2008 Minute Order: Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to Xcentric Ventures, LLC, DBA Ripoffreport.com is pending before Judge David G. Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
September 23, 2008 1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 37(a) and 45(c)(2)(B). Case Opening Fee Received: $ 39.00 receipt number 09700000000002244614, filed by Xcentric Ventures, L.L.C., ECOMMERCE INNOVATIONS L.L.C.,a Nevada limited liability company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A and Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dybus, Donnelly) Modified on 9/24/2008 (REK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C. v. Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Xcentric Ventures, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecommerce Innovations L.L.C.
Represented By: Donnelly Andrew Dybus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?