Motion Picture Association of America v. CrystalTech Web Hosting Inc.

Plaintiff: Motion Picture Association of America
Defendant: CrystalTech Web Hosting Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008mc00130
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motion Picture Association of America. (Vynalek, Christopher)
January 6, 2009 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motion Picture Association of America of Letter and Subpoena served upon CrystalTech Web Hosting, Inc. (Vynalek, Christopher)
December 23, 2008 2 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/7/2009 as to Motion Picture Association of America. (MHA)
December 22, 2008 1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Foreign Subpoenas - FRCVP 45. Case Opening Fee Received: $ 39.00 receipt number PHX079156, filed by Motion Picture Association of America. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena, # 2 Request)(SUBPOENA ISSUED AT THE COUNTER FOR CRYSTAL TECH WEB HOSTING, INC. MHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motion Picture Association of America v. CrystalTech Web Hosting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motion Picture Association of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrystalTech Web Hosting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?