Mansour v. Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Issam Mansour
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00037
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 26 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/15/2009.(NVO)
April 21, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Cal-Western's request for attorneys' fees is denied without prejudice; the Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/09.(REW, )
February 6, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Amend the Complaint, the Clerk is directed to file the proposed lodged amended complaint; denying as moot the 8 Motion to Dismiss the original complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/6/09.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansour v. Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issam Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?