Hillis, et al v. Heineman, et al

Plaintiff: Steve Hillis
Defendant: Barbara L Heineman and Ronald E Heineman
Case Number: 2:2009cv00073
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/31/2009.(NVO)
August 18, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion for New Trial; denying 89 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall not file a response to the motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/18/2009.(NVO)
July 23, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 65 Motion to Dismiss Case; the complaint 1 , counterclaims 20 , 52 , and third-party complaint 29 are dismissed without prejudice; denying Defendants' 74 Motion for Sanctions; the Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/23/09.(REW, )
May 14, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/14/2009.(NVO)
April 1, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/1/2009.(NVO)
March 25, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Stay discovery; granting 42 Motion to Expedite ruling; denying without prejudice 15 Motion to disqualify counsel. Case Management Conference remains set for 3/27/2009 at 4:30 pm. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillis, et al v. Heineman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Hillis
Represented By: Shawn Louis Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L Heineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E Heineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?