Carbajal et al v. Dorn, et al

Plaintiff: Michael E. Carbajal and Mary E. Carbajal
Defendant: Liberty Life Insurance CO., David A. Dorn, Jane Doe Dorn and Dorn Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00283
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 96 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/13/2010.(NVO)
March 9, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/9/2010.(NVO)
February 4, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' motions 53 , 63 to strike amended complaint are granted. The Clerk is directed to strike the amended complaint (Dkt. #48) from the record. Plaintiffs shall file a new amended complaint by February 12, 2010. Defendants shall have until February 26, 2010 to file answers. The applicable dates and deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order (Dkt. #22) shall remain in effect. The Court will address the motions for partial summary judgment (Dkt. ##37, 40) by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/4/10.(KMG)
November 5, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint naming Danny Carbajal as a defendant on or before 11/20/2009; plaintiffs shall serve process on Danny Carbajal on or before 12/18/2009. The dates and deadlines set forth in the case management order 22 shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/5/2009.(NVO)
April 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbajal et al v. Dorn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Insurance CO.
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Dorn
Represented By: Steven G Mesaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorn Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G Mesaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Carbajal
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Carbajal
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?