Avenue 6E Investments, LLC et al v. Yuma, City of

Plaintiff: Avenue 6E Investments, LLC and Saguaro Desert Land, Inc
Defendant: Yuma, City of
Case Number: 2:2009cv00297
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2018 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 266 Motion in Limine re: Exclude Inadmissible Evidence. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 5/31/18. (JWS)
April 19, 2018 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 260 Motion to Change Venue. If this case goes to trial, trial will be held in YUMA, Arizona. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/19/18. (JWS)
January 29, 2018 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 242 Motion for Summary Judgment. The City's motion at docket 242 for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' disparate impact claim under the FHA is DENIED. The City's request for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' Count V in the second amended complaint is DENIED AS MOOT; plaintiffs concede that claim is not being pursued. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/29/18. (JWS)
October 28, 2017 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 238 Motion to Amend Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/28/17.(JWS)
May 1, 2017 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 218 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' disparate impact claim under the FHA. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/30/17.(DXD)
June 5, 2013 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 148 Motion for Summary Judgment is HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/5/2013.(LFIG)
May 10, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 45 Motion for Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b), or alternatively, to certify appeal under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(b). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 5/10/10.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avenue 6E Investments, LLC et al v. Yuma, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avenue 6E Investments, LLC
Represented By: John A Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saguaro Desert Land, Inc
Represented By: John A Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuma, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?