Ramirez v. Litton Loan Servicing LP et al

Plaintiff: Ella C Ramirez
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP and Penny Mac Loan Services
Case Number: 2:2009cv00319
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dfts' 5 , 7 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's 1 Complaint (Pt. 2 at 7-11) is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this matter. (SAT)
April 13, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 18 Motion to Declare Litton Loan Serving LP and Penny Mac Loan Services To Be Unsecured Creditors, is summarily denied without prejudice. Directing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Robert A. Mackenzie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 04/10/09.(ESL)
March 19, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying this lawsuit in its entirety and placing it on inactive status until June 19, 2009 (90 days) for dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Robert A. Mackenzie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 03/18/09. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Litton Loan Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella C Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Represented By: Sarah Roshanne Anchors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Mac Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?