McReaken v. Schriro et al

Plaintiff: John Daniel McReaken
Defendant: Dora B. Schriro, Jerry Sterns, James Franco, Richard Webster and William Whittenberger
Case Number: 2:2009cv00327
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 44) and Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Transfer Retention Funds (Doc. 47). Granting 44 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Transfer Retention Funds. Clerk of Court must terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/23/11.(DMT)
May 5, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/4/10.(REW)
May 26, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Dft Webster is dismissed without prejudice. Dfts Schriro, Sterns, Franco, and Whittenberger must answer the Complaint. The Clerk must send Pla a service packet including the Complaint 1 , this Order, and both summons and requ est for waiver forms for Dfts Schriro, Sterns, Franco, and Whittenberger. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Service Packet due by 6/15/2009.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/22/09. (KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McReaken v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Daniel McReaken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sterns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Whittenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?