DIRECTV, Inc. v. Eagle West Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: DIRECTV, Inc.
Defendant: Eagle West Communications, Inc., Hotel Movie Network, B2Digital, Inc., Coast Communications Inc., United Business Services, Inc., Paul D.H. Labarre, Terri S LaBarre, Ernest G McKay, Elizabeth R McKay, J Michael Heil, Fred Peterson, Indevideo Company, Inc., Alvin H Williams, Saundra A Williams, Kevin L Williams and Jane Doe Williams
Case Number: 2:2009cv00379
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Cable/Satellite TV Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2015 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 218 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and denying 224 Motion for Reconsideration (see PDF for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/6/2015. (ACL)
January 22, 2015 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 208 LaBarres' Motion to Proceed Pr Se Counsel; ORDERED denying 209 LaBarres' Motion to Reconsider; ORDERED denying 210 LaBarres' Motion to Stay Dated October 30, 2014. (See attached Order). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/22/2015.(TLB)
October 30, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting DIRECTV's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses (Doc. 200 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding DIRECTV $437,079.86 in attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs against Paul LaBarre and Terri LaBarre, jointly and severally. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/30/2014.(KMG)
January 23, 2013 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 182 . Defendants' Objection to the Writ of Garnishment is Overruled. Plaintiff's 157 Motion for Judgment against the Garnishee is Granted. That within seven days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit a proposed Judgment against Garnishee. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/23/13. (DMT)
December 17, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Defendants' Objection to the Writ of Garnishment is overruled, and that Plaintiff's Application for Judgment against the Garnishee 157 be GRANTED re 157 MOTION for Judgment Against Garnishee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 12/17/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIRECTV, Inc. v. Eagle West Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIRECTV, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Paul Fischer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle West Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Movie Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B2Digital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Communications Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Business Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D.H. Labarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri S LaBarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest G McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth R McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Michael Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indevideo Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin H Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saundra A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?