Burritt v. Nutracea et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Burritt
Defendant: Nutracea, Bradley D Edson, Todd C Crow and David Bensol
Case Number: 2:2009cv00406
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Bradley Edson's motion to dismiss 63 . FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Todd Crow's motion to dismiss 59 . It is granted on plaintiffs' Section 10(b) and Rule 10b-5 claim. It is denied on all others. Plaintiffs' Section 10(b) and Rule 10b-5 claim against Edson and Section 20(a) and Arizona Securities Act claims against Edson and Crow remain. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/24/10.(KMG)
January 26, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion to Amend court's scheduling order as indicated in this order including discovery that must be completed by 7/30/10. That the claims against NutraCea are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to our order filed November 17, 2009 80 . Denying as moot 60 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims by NutraCea. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/26/10.(DMT)
September 25, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file a joint response; denying 35 Defendant Crow's Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; denying 36 Defendant Edson's Motion to Dismis s Case; and denying 37 Defendant NutraCea's Motion to Dismiss Case. See PDF document as to the amendment to the Rule 16 Scheduling Order. The Clerk shall file the lodged amended consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/24/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burritt v. Nutracea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Burritt
Represented By: Richard Glenn Himelrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutracea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley D Edson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd C Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bensol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?