Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fraser et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Martin G. Fraser, Don W. Watson, Edward W. O'Brien and Gary M. Opper
Case Number: 2:2009cv00443
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 15:77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss Case, as spelled out in this order. The claims against Dfts Fraser and Watson in the 1st Amended Complaint are therefore dismissed with leave to replead. FURTHER ORDERED that the SEC shall file a 2nd amended complaint that complies with the applicable rules and the requirements of this order by 5:00 p.m. on 9/11/09. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/11/2009. (LAD)
June 1, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 24 Motion to Intervene and 24 Motion to Stay. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/29/2009. (LAD)
May 13, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case; also filed as Dkt. #29 of CR-09-00365-PHX-FJM; and Dkt. #30 of CR-09-00372-PHX-SRB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CR-09-00365-PHX-FJM is transferred to Judge Bolton. Civil case CV 09-443 PHX-GMS shall remain with this Court. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/13/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fraser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Donald Werner Searles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin G. Fraser
Represented By: David J. Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don W. Watson
Represented By: Paul J Roshka, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward W. O'Brien
Represented By: Dan Marmalefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Opper
Represented By: Gordon A. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?