Zep Inc. v. Brody Chemical Company, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Zep Inc.
Defendant: Brody Chemical Company, Inc., Mark Bartley, Neil Carse, Wayne Cassidy, Richard Crouse and Anthony Strukel
Case Number: 2:2009cv00505
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dft Brody Chemical Company, Inc's 146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, joined by Dfts Mark Bartley, Neil Carse, Wayne Cassidy, and Anthony Strukel, is granted in part and denied in part. Because the ruling is not dispositive of any claims, no claims will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/6/10. (SAT)
May 4, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court's order granting Zep's preliminary injunction is amended. ORDER that Zep must post a preliminary injunction bond of $250,000 before a preliminary injunction will issue re 68 Motion for Clarification (see order for details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/4/09.(TLJ) Modified on 5/13/2009 to designate as written opinon(LAL).
April 20, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: ORDERED that Plaintiff Zep, Inc.s motion for preliminary injunction (doc. # 1) is granted. Plaintiff shall lodge a proposed form of preliminary injunction, including a list of Restricted Customers, after conferring with the Defendants to determine if a form of order can be agreed upon, but in any event no later than April 27, 2009. If the parties cannot agree on the list, further evidentiary proceedings will be held expeditiously to resolve it. A p reliminary injunction bond in the amount of $100,000.00 must be posted before a preliminary injunction will issue. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/20/09. (SJF) Modified on 5/13/2009 to designate as written opinion(LAL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zep Inc. v. Brody Chemical Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zep Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brody Chemical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Carse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Strukel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?