Martinelli et al v. Petland, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: JoDell Martinelli, Stephanie Booth, Melia Perry, Abbigail King, Nicole Kersanty and Ruth Ross
Defendant: Petland, Inc. and Hunte Corporation
Case Number: 2:2009cv00529
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 129 , 137 Motions for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel. FURTHER The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/12/11. (MAP)
April 7, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion for Judgment or for certification of interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/2010.(NVO)
January 26, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting 59 Motion to Dismiss Case. The court will set a scheduling conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/26/2010.(NVO)
August 27, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to file amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall have until 9/11/2009 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/27/2009.(NVO)
August 7, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: the 33 , 34 Motions to Dismiss filed by Dfts Hunte Corporation and Petland, Inc. are granted. The 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Pla shall have until 8/29/09 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/7/09.(SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinelli et al v. Petland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoDell Martinelli
Represented By: Donald Andrew St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Booth
Represented By: Donald Andrew St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melia Perry
Represented By: Donald Andrew St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbigail King
Represented By: Donald Andrew St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kersanty
Represented By: Donald Andrew St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ross
Represented By: Donald Andrew St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunte Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?