Ajilon Professional Staffing, LLC v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC
Defendant: Shad Griffin, Lucas Group and Jane Doe Griffin
Case Number: 2:2009cv00561
Filed: March 20, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Hearing set as to motion to enforce settlement agreement 72 set for 12/4/2009 at 2:00 PM in courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2009. (NVO)
October 29, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla shall, by 11/4/09, file with the Court (i) the written settlement agreement and (ii) the e-mail correspondence dated 9/2 and 9/4/09. 2. Mr. Fletcher shall comply with Local Rule 83.3(a) by 11/4/09. 3. The Clerk shall serve this order on cnsl of record and Mr. Fletcher, whose address is Lake & Cobb, P.L.C., 1095 West Rio Salado Parkway, Tempe, Arizona, 85281. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/29/09. (SAT)
May 29, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Correction made to page 9, paragraph 4. Date should have been April 10, 2010, not April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/2009. (NVO)
May 28, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/28/2009. (NVO)
April 10, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. This temporary restraining order shall remain in effect until the conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing on 5/26/09(see order for details). Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell re motion 16 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/10/09. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajilon Professional Staffing, LLC v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?