Hernandez v. Astrue

Plaintiff: John C Hernandez
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 2:2009cv00621
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/24/2011.(NVO)
January 15, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's decision denying benefits is reversed. The Clerk is directed to remand the case for an award of benefits. Signed by Judge David G. Campbell on 01/15/10. (ESL)
October 7, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to renew opening brief. Defendant shall file an answering brief on or before 11/6/2009; Plaintiff shall file a reply brief on or before 11/27/2009 or within five days of the answering brief, notify the Court that he does not intend to filoe a reply brief. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/7/2009.(NVO)
September 2, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended complaint to be filed no later than 9/11/2009; answer to amended complaint to be filed no later than 9/25/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/2009.(NVO )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Hernandez
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?