Ball v. Peoria, City of et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Andrew Ball
Defendant: Peoria, City of and Peoria Police Department, City of
Case Number: 2:2009cv00635
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 18 Motion to Dismiss filed by the City of Peoria; this action is dismissed in its entirety; the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/11/09.(REW, )
June 12, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Exemption from fees for accessing PACER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/12/09. (MAP)
April 30, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's claim against the City of Peoria Police Department is DISMISSED without prejudice because it is not a jural entity separate and apart from the City of Peoria. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, docket # 5 , and Motion for Service, docket # 4 , are GRANTED without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Service of the Complaint and Summons by waiver or otherwise on Dft shall be at Government exp ense by the U.S. Marshal Service or his authorized representative. The Clerk is kindly directed to promptly send Pla a service packet including the Complaint, docket # 1, and this Order, and summons, request for waiver forms, and form to consent to m agistrate judge for Dft City of Peoria. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 20 days of the filing of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's Motion to Consolidate Case, docket # 6 , is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/29/09.(KMG, )
April 7, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this lawsuit against the City and its Police Department should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to file a Notice of Claim and failure to file this lawsuit within the one-year statute of limitations. Show Cause Response due by 4/20/2009.Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/6/09. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Peoria, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Andrew Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoria, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoria Police Department, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?