Neuromechanical Innovations LLC v. Manna Omni International Inc.

Plaintiff: Neuromechanical Innovations LLC
Defendant: Manna Omni International Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00680
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/22/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/19/2010. (TCA, )
December 23, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Claims Construction Brief and Evidence. The deadline for plaintiff to submit its proposed claim construction is January 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/23/2009.(TCA, )
December 2, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: (see order details) Discovery due by 3/1/2010. Dispositive motions due by 3/31/2010. Proposed Pretrial statement due by 6/8/2010 at 9:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washing ton Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Markman Hearing set for 6/8/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/2/2009. (TCA, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuromechanical Innovations LLC v. Manna Omni International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neuromechanical Innovations LLC
Represented By: John Charles Mascari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manna Omni International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?