Baja Developments LLC v. TSD Loreto Partners, S en C. Por A. de C.V.

Plaintiff: Baja Developments LLC
Defendant: TSD Loreto Partners, S en C. Por A. de C.V.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00756
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 27 of Magistrate Judge Anderson. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Baja Developments LLC, against Defendant TSD Loreto Partners, S en C. Por A. De C.V., in the amount of $8,442,044.00, with interest thereon from the date of judgment at the federal judgment interest rate. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/2/10. (LSP)
April 30, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 18 MOTION for Attorney Fees Award and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 20 Application for Entry of Default: Recommending that that Baja New Yo rk's Application for Entry of Default Judgment and Default Hearing Memorandum against Loreto Partners be Granted; that Baja New York's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs etc, be denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if this Report and Recommendation is approved by District Judge Wake or if he otherwise directs, the Clerk is kindly directed to enter Judgment consistent with this Order pursuant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 04/30/10. (ESL)
August 28, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 OBJECTION re 8 Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff has discharged its duty to respond to the August 19, 2009 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall either serve Defendant on or before November 27, 2009, or shall file a Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/27/09. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baja Developments LLC v. TSD Loreto Partners, S en C. Por A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baja Developments LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSD Loreto Partners, S en C. Por A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?