Murdaugh v. Ryan, et al

Petitioner: Michael Joe Murdaugh
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Case Number: 2:2009cv00831
Filed: April 20, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 35) is denied. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly; Petitioner's 51 motion for evidentiary development is denied. It is further ordered that the stay of exec ution entered by this Court on 04/21/09 (Doc. 6), is vacated. It is further ordered granting a Certificate of Appealability as to the following issues: (see attached pdf). It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court forward a courtesy copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 09/02/10. (ESL)
January 19, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's 46 Motion to Continue Motion for Evidentiary Development is DENIED. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/19/10. (SAT)
December 17, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Motion 39 to Continue Time to Reply to Answer to Petition is DENIED. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/17/09.(KMG)
October 8, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot petitioner's 25 Motion to Supplement District Court Record. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/7/2009. (LAD)
June 4, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court transmit at copy of the minutes, instruments and transcripts from petitioner's trial and sentencing (Maricopa County Superior Court No. CR1995-006472); the minutes, instruments and transcripts fr om any Rule 32 proceedings in the possession of the Arizona Supreme Court; and a copy of any briefs filed in the Arizona Supreme Court (Arizona Supreme Court No. CR-01-0421-AP; any related Special Action proceedings; and any related petitions for review) to: Richard H. Weare, Clerk, US District Court....; FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a copy of this order to: Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court.... Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/3/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdaugh v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Joe Murdaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?