Mahai Dutciuc v. Meritage Homes of Arizona Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mahai Dutciuc
Defendant: Meritage Homes of Arizona Inc, MTH Mortgage LLC and Does
Case Number: 2:2009cv00866
Filed: April 24, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 83 Motion for Ruling; granting 87 Motion to Strike Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/1/11.(LAD)
February 9, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff must both show cause and file a response to Meritage's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses no later than the close of business on Tuesday, February 15, 2011. Failure to comply with this deadline will result in the summary granting of Defendant's motion pursuant to LRCiv. 7.2(I). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/7/11. (LAD)
December 10, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants to Motion Request to Transform its Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings. (Dkt. #61).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings (formerly its Motion to Dismiss) without prejudice. (Dkt. #58).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiff leave to file his third amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiff to file his third amended complaint by December 30, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as Moot Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Dkt. #58).Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/9/09.(KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahai Dutciuc v. Meritage Homes of Arizona Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahai Dutciuc
Represented By: Richard V McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritage Homes of Arizona Inc
Represented By: Joshua B Vinograd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTH Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Adam R Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?