Scott v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Leslie W Scott
Defendant: Phoenix, City of and Randy Spenla
Case Number: 2:2009cv00875
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs, with Plaintiffs to take nothing. ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/25/11.(TLJ)
May 5, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - granting 65 Stipulation re: 61 Motion for Summary Judgement. ORDERED extending plaintiff's time to file his response in opposition to the motion for summary judgment to 5/10/2011. ORDERED that defendants' reply in support of their motion for summary judgement shall be filed no later than 15 days after plaintiff's response is filed. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/5/2011. (TLB)
March 24, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. It is further ordered that Defendants shall file a memorandum by 04/15/11, regarding whether summary judgment is appropriate under the McDonnell Douglas burden-shifting analysis, and whether there are any material facts genuinely in dispute. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' memorandum by 05/06/11. The parties shall support their memoranda with citations to particular parts of materials in the record, as required by Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If necessary, the Court will order a reply. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 03/24/11. (ESL)
October 16, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Randy Spenla's Motion for Judgment on Pleadings on Title VII and Section 1981 Claims; granting 10 Motion to join plaintiff's spouse as a party plaintiff. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/15/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie W Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Spenla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?