Johnson v. Maricopa County Jail Medical Department et al

Plaintiff: Charles Lee Johnson
Defendant: Maricopa County Jail Medical Department, CA 817, CS 861 and CH 684
Case Number: 2:2009cv00971
Filed: May 8, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Defendant's 81 Motion to Strike. Defendant's 63 Motion for Su mmary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Defendant's 81 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Defendant John Doe is dismissed. This action is dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/07/11. (ESL)
January 27, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 01/27/11. (ESL)
June 30, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/30/10.(REW)
March 4, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) that dft Nurse Pam (CA 817) must answer count I of the amended complaint 9 . The Clerk must send to pla a service packet...for dft Nurse Pam (CA 817). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. section 636(b)(1). (See document for full details). Service Packet due by 3/24/2010. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/4/10. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Maricopa County Jail Medical Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Jail Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA 817
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS 861
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH 684
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?