Londen Land Company, LLC v. Title Resources Guaranty Company

Plaintiff: Londen Land Company, LLC
Defendant: Title Resources Guaranty Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv00980
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 56 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses; TRGC is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $10,569.25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 2/11/11.(REW)
February 11, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Londen's Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 2/10/11.(TLJ)
August 3, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/2/10.(REW)
January 7, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk of the Court shall file the lodged proposed First Amended Complaint. Denyng as moot 21 TRGC's Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice and with leave to refile all or part of said motion. That TRGC shall respond to the First Amended Complaint within 20 days from the date this Order is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 1/6/10.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Londen Land Company, LLC v. Title Resources Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Resources Guaranty Company
Represented By: Henry L Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Londen Land Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?