Jimenez v. Newell, et al

Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Jimenez
Defendant: Julie P Newell, Christopher T Whitten, Andrew Thomas, Joesph M Arpaio and Arizona, State of
Case Number: 2:2009cv00998
Filed: May 11, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/8/11.(LSP)
December 3, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; party State of Arizona, Julie P Newell and Christopher T Whitten terminated; County Defendants' motion is denied as moot; denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Appoin t Counsel; denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Civil Remedy; denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for investigation; and denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion to include all Parties incolved in case No. CV 09-998 PHX-DGC and for Injunctive Relief. The action is dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/09.(LSP)
September 4, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Dft Thomas and Arpaio's 16 Motion for More Definite Statement is denied as moot. Pla shall, by 9/25/09, file a response to the 16 Motion to Quash Service and a response to the 18 Motion to Dismiss the amended complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/4/09. (SAT)
August 3, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Complaint, 1 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has until 9/4/09 to file and amended complaint. Clerk must terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 4 Motion to Bring Forward the Verdict in this Case and 13 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/3/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Newell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie P Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joesph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?