Jordan v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Cedric Ross Jordan
Defendant: Charles Ryan, William White, Delena Carrillo and F Burch
Case Number: 2:2009cv01013
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Pla's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment and Dfts' 30 Motion to Strike. Pla's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied without prejudice. Dft's 30 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/19/10. (SAT)
September 24, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Pla's Motion 7 to Expedite is denied. Count III of the Amended Complaint and Defendants Buchanan, Lacy, Flowers, Coberg, Zaborsky, Salak, and Garibay are dismissed without prejudice. Dfts Sambora, Ryan, Carrillo, White , Deepe, Bilderback, and Rabb must answer Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the Amended Complaint 6 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts Sambora, Rya n, Carrillo, White, Deepe, Bilderback, and Rabb. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Service Packet due by 10/14/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/09. (KMG, )
June 5, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint 1 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Pla has 30 days from the date this order is filed to file a 1st amended complaint in compliance with this order. If pla fai ls to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. section 1915(g). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/4/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Ross Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delena Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?