McCreary v. United States of America

Petitioner: Derrick L McCreary
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2009cv01023
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. No further filings will be accepted in this closed case. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/29/13.(DMT)
May 16, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING petitioner's motion for reconsideration (doc. 16). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/16/11.(KMG)
December 30, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 13 . The 4 motion to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentence is denied. Denying a Certificate of Appealability as Movant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, the m otion's denial is justified by a plain procedural bar, and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. Moreover, briefing on whether a certificate should issue would not be helpful. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/29/09. (DMT, )
December 4, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 4 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) as to Derrick McCreary : Recommending that the Motion be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 12/3/09. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCreary v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick L McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Charles Fred Hyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?