McAllister v. IndyMac Federal Bank FSB

Plaintiff: Catherine McAllister
Defendant: IndyMac Federal Bank FSB
Case Number: 2:2009cv01075
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER upon the Stipulation and agreement of the parties that Dft and its appointed Trustee are enjoined for an additional period of 38 Days from the date and time of the issuance of this Order from conducting or pursuing in any way a trustee's sale of Pla's property; that no bond is required of Pla for this TRO. It is further ordered setting a Telephonic Conference set for 9/4/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/29/09. (NOTE: see attached pdf for full details) (ESL)
June 30, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER that pla's application for a preliminary injunction 13 is DENIED. No bond is required of pla for this TRO extension. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/29/2009 09:30 AM before Judge G Murray Snow. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/30/2009. (LAD)
June 11, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER that Pla's 11 Application for Reissuance or Extension of Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED; that no bond is required of Pla for this TRO extension. Setting a hearing on Pla's request for a Preliminary Inju nction for 06/29/09 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. Pla to serve notification of this Order upon Dft. Pla is further directed to provide a copy of this Order to Dft within twenty-four hours of its issuance. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 06/11/09. (NOTE: Please see attached pdf for further instructions) (ESL)
May 21, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting pla's application for temporary restraining order 4 . FURTHER ORDERED dft and its appointed Trustee are enjoined for a period of 10 days from the date of issuance of this order from conducting or pursuing in any way a trustee's sale of pla's property located at 4241 W. Monte Cristo Ave., Phoenix, AZ 85053. FURTHER ORDERED this order is binding on dft; dft's officers, agents, servants, employees and attorneys' and any person acting in concert or participation with anyone previously described and having actual notice hereof. FURTHER ORDERED that no bond is required of pla for this TRO order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/21/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister v. IndyMac Federal Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine McAllister
Represented By: David J Adamski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Federal Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?