stern et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: barry l stern, judy stern and barry l. stern as trustee for the urology clinic ltd profit sharing plan dated April 8, 1991
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA and Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01229
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Wells Fargo's motion 47 to dismiss with prejudice is granted. Schwab's motion 33 for judgment on the pleadings is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/10.(KMG)
December 1, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's 31 Motion for leave to file a 2nd amended complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged proposed 2nd amended complaint 32 . The response and reply to the motion for judgment on the pleadings 33 shall address the allegations contained in the 2nd amended. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/30/2009.(LAD)
October 16, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 defendant Schwab's Motion to Dismiss Case and compel arbitration; granting 21 Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/15/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: stern et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: barry l stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: judy stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: barry l. stern as trustee for the urology clinic ltd profit sharing plan dated April 8, 1991
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?