Garcia v. Regis Corporation

Plaintiff: Lorrie A. Garcia
Defendant: Regis Corporation
Case Number: 2:2009cv01282
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 96 Motion for Reconsideration; finding as moot 97 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/15/2011.(NVO)
May 16, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 90 Motion for Reconsideration; this Court's order granting Defendant summary judgment in part 86 is vacated in part as stated in this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/13/11.(REW)
March 22, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration/motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/2011.(NVO)
March 9, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court shall set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/9/2011.(NVO)
November 23, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/23/2010.(NVO)
April 7, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Regis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie A. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?