Martenson v. RG Financing et al
Plaintiff: Holly Martenson
Defendant: RG Financing, JL Financing, Anthony Reese-Thomas, Edward Many and Does
Case Number: 2:2009cv01314
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: Defendants' 115 Motion for Attorneys' Fees is DENIED. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 03/10/11. (NKS)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER that Plaintiff's 110 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended and Supplemental Complaint is DENIED. It is further ordered that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff, and that Plaintiff take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 02/1/11. (ESL)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 106 is GRANTED. This dismissal is without prejudice to a subsequent motion to amend under Rule 15(a)(2), but Plaintiff must file such a motion, if desired, by December 10, 2010. Otherwise, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants JL Financing and RG Financing will be dismissed with prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/9/10.(DMT)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint (Doc. 90) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that JL Financing and RG Financing's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts 1, 2, 4, 6, 8 and 10 of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 73) is granted. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/21/10.(KMG)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 92 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/17/10. (SAT)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION that dfts RG Financing and JL Financing, their officers, agents, servants, employees and attorneys and all persons acting in active concert or participation with them are enjoined from taking any action whatsoever to enforce th e "Judgment Order" issued by the McDowell Mountain Justice Court in a certain forcible detainer action.... FURTHER ORDERED that this order and preliminary injunction shall take effect when pla posts a bond in the amount of $100.00 pursuant to Rule 65(c), Fed.R.Civ.P. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/5/10. (LAD)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/22/10.(LSP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martenson v. RG Financing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Martenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RG Financing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL Financing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Reese-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Many
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?