ITEQ Corporation v. ISOLA USA Corporation, a Delaware corporation

Plaintiff: ITEQ Corporation
Defendant: ISOLA USA Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Case Number: 2:2009cv01318
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, purusant to stipulation; this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs; all pending motions in this case are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/12/10. (REW)
January 5, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Joint Submission of Protective Order; Joint Submission of Protective Order is entered in the above-captioned action. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/5/2010.(TCA, ) Modified on 1/7/2010 (JEMB, TO INCLUDE MTN RULING/REFLECT OPINION).
December 23, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Continue. All deadlines established by the Court's November 30, 2009 Scheduling Order are continued by four weeks. Discovery due by 3/5/2010. Dispositive motions due by 4/5/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2010. The Court will enter an order to follow with new dates for the Markman hearing, pretrial conference, and trial. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/22/09.(LSP)
October 20, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Dft Isola's 9 Motion to Enforce Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures Pursuant to the Parties' Settlement Agreement and to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/19/09.(ESL, )
September 29, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's 27 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in response to Dft Isola's argument in its Reply brief as it pertains to the term "third party arbitrator." The Clerk of the Court shall file the 28 Lodged Proposed Surreply. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 09/28/09.(ESL, )
July 8, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Seal or Strike Isola's original Corporate Disclosure Statement filed on June 30, 2009. [Docket No. 8.] The Clerk of the Court shall strike Isola's Corporate Disclosure Statement filed on June 30, 2009. Granting Parties' 13 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion for Expedited Consideration and Request for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline, filed on July 6, 2009. The deadline for ISOLA to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint shall be ten (10) days after the Court's entry of an order resolving the "Motion to Enforce Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures Pursuant to Parties' Settlement Agreement and to Stay Proceedings" ("Motion to Enforce and Stay") filed June 30, 2009. [Docket No. 9.]That the Motion for Expedited Consideration 10 filed on June 30, 2009 and the Objection to the Motion to Expedite Consideration 11 filed on July 1, 2009 are hereby deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/7/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ITEQ Corporation v. ISOLA USA Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITEQ Corporation
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISOLA USA Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?