Gruender v. Rosell et al

Plaintiff: Daniel F. Gruender
Defendant: Harald Rosell, D. Bruce Gardiner and The Gardiner Law Firm, P.S.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01347
Filed: June 23, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dfts The Gardiner Law Firm and D. Bruce Gardiner's 60 motion for attorneys' fees is granted. Pursuant to A.R.S. § 12-341.01, attorneys' fees in the amount of $25,293.12 are awarded in favor of Defendants The Gard iner Law Firm and D. Bruce Gardiner. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk is further directed to terminate the 63 memorandum of points and authorities erroneously filed as a motion. Plaintiff Daniel Gruender's 69 request for reversal of the award of taxable costs is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 07/26/10. (ESL)
May 24, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT that Plaintiff Daniel Gruender's motion default judgment 51 is granted. Default Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Harald Rosell in the amount of $3,227,576.13 (U.S. Dollars), plus late fees and interest accrued after 2/25/10 and until judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/21/10. (TLJ)
March 23, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion 45 for entry of default and default judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk is directed to enter Defendant Harald Rosell's default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff shall have until April 2, 2010 to file a new motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/10. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gruender v. Rosell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel F. Gruender
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harald Rosell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bruce Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gardiner Law Firm, P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?