Rose v. Wildflower Bread Company

Plaintiff: Alison Rose
Defendant: Wildflower Bread Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv01348
Filed: June 23, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 154 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall file Exhibit A to the proposed Settlement Agreement, which is currently lodged at Docket 155 , under seal. The Clerk shall not seal the remainder of the Settlement Agreement filed at Dock et 155 ; only Exhibit A will be sealed. The remainder of the Settlement Agreement shall be filed into the record. FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING the partie's Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. 151 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the Settlement Agreement is approved in all respects and that the Clerk shall dismiss this case with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING as moot the parties' Sealed Joint Motion to Approve Settlement and Enter Final Judgment (Doc. 157 ) because the Court has granted the Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement found at Docket 151 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/28/11.(MAP)
June 14, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Joint Motion for Relief from Judgment. The Clerk shall vacate the Clerk's Judgment entered on May 23, 2011 148 . FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 149 Joint Motion for Leave to File Confidential Settlement Agreement Under Seal FURTHER ORDERED that the lodged Proposed Settlement Agreement 150 shall remain under seal, but be stricken from the record. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/14/11. (MAP)
January 20, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The Court vacates the portion of its May 4, 2010 Order that granted judgment on the pleadings to Defendant on Plaintiffs Count II. The Court hereby reinstates Plaintiff's Count II Arizona Wage Act claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 109 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Certify Class. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/20/11.(LSP)
May 4, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dft's 33 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings as to Counts II only; denying Pla's Cross 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the pleadings as moot; granting Dft's 46 Motion for Leave to File Amended An swer. Dft shall have 15 days from the date of this Order to file its Amended Answer; denying in part and granting in part Pla's 34 Motion for Collective Action Notification, Motion for Class Action Certification and Motion to Toll Statute of Limitations; denying Dft's 74 Motion to Cease and Desist. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 05/04/10. (NOTE: please see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Wildflower Bread Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Rose
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildflower Bread Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?