Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Inc. v. Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix

Plaintiff: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix
Case Number: 2:2009cv01405
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting the briefing schedule for the quantification of attorney's fees and taxable costs as follows: Defendant shall file its opening brief and documentation by November 9, 2012; Plaintiff's response shall be filed by December 14, 2012; and Defendant's reply shall be filed by January 11, 2013. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/11/12. (NKS)
January 20, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Diocese of Phoenix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That There Will Be No Apportionment of the Settlements Between Covered and Uncovered Amounts 118 is granted; Interstate Fire's Request for Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That There Will Be No Apportionment of the Settlements Between Covered and Uncovered Amounts 130 is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/20/12.(REW)
January 19, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's 115 Motion to Compel Production of Witness Interviews and Timelines is granted. Defendant shall produce the witness interview summaries and timelines, with Defendants proposed redactions, to the Court by February 8, 2012. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/19/12. (NKS)
February 8, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Interstate Fire's Motion for Summary Judgment 36 is denied; Diocese's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on First Phase Issues 38 is denied as to the issue of whether there was an "occurrence" under the policy and granted as to the applicability of the assault and battery exclusion and the efficient proximate cause doctrine. ORDER setting a case management conference for 3/23/11 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file proposed individual or joint reports as to how the case should proceed no later than 3/18/11. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/7/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Inc. v. Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard Harris Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?