CLN Properties et al v. Republic Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CLN Properties and Maevers Management Company
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc. and Allied Waste Industries, Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv01428
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion to Certify Class FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 107 Motion to Strike the Declaration of Scott Russeth FURTHER ORDERED The Clerk is directed to file the document lodged as Doc. 118 under seal FURTHER ORDERED On or before 12/30/10, Plaintiffs shall file a brief memorandumadvising the Court of how they would like to proceed with this case in light of the Court's denial of class certification. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/10.(MAP)
October 25, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion to Seal and directing the clerk to file under seal the documents lodged at Docs. 91 , 92 , 93 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10. (cc: all cnsl)(MAP)
June 22, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/10.(TLJ)
June 15, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 48 Motion to Amend; granting Plaintiffs' 51 Motion to Amend; as of the date of this order, the following Plaintiffs are named in this case: CLN Properties, Inc., Maevers Management Company, Inc., Gordy Development, LLC, Walnut Woods Condominium I Association, Inc., Country Club of Brewton, Inc., Mary Brooks Pittman, Jackie Ullery, and Academy Street Villa Home Owners Association. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/14/10.(REW)
January 13, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss Case. Rule 16 Case Management Conference to be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/13/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLN Properties et al v. Republic Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLN Properties
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Jann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maevers Management Company
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Jann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Waste Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?