Angel Jet Services, LLC, v. Giant Eagle, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Angel Jet Services LLC
Defendant: Giant Eagle Group Health Insurance and Giant Eagle Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2009cv01489
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on all State Law Claims and dismissing Plaintiff's state law claims from this action; granting 47 Motion to Remand ERISA claims to Plan Administrator for Completion of Administrative Proceedings. Remanding Angel Jet's ERISA claims to the Plan Administrator. Directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/30/10.(DMT)
March 29, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/26/10.(KSP)
March 4, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/3/10. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing Angel Jet to produce the alleged assignment to Defendants forthwith. Wells Fargo & Co. v. Wells Fargo Exp. Co., 556 F.2d 406, 430 n.24 (9th Cir. 1977) (explaining that a court may allow discovery to aid in determining whether it has in personam or subject matter jurisdiction).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the parties to meet and confer and to jointly submit a statement regarding their respective positions regarding the validity of the alleged assignment no later than March 8, 2010. (KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel Jet Services, LLC, v. Giant Eagle, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Jet Services LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Mark Allen Bracken
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Eagle Group Health Insurance
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Eagle Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Bernard D Marcus
Represented By: Scott D Livingston
Represented By: Stephen S Zubrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?