Bernal et al v. Daewoo Motor America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Manuel Bernal, Paula Bernal and Christopher Bernal
Defendant: Daewoo Motor America, Inc. and Daewoo Motor Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01502
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 170 motion to amend is granted in part and denied in part as stated above. Guadalupe Alicia Alvarado Rubio is added as a plaintiff in this case. Daewoo Co.'s 213 motion to strike is denied. Plaintiffs 176 motio n for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part as stated above. Daewoo Co.'s 183 motion for partial summary judgment is denied. Daewoo Co.'s 182 motion in limine with regard to expert witness Byron Bloch is denied. Daewoo Co.'s 181 motion in limine with regard to expert witnesses Michael Braun and Joseph Burton is granted in part and denied in part as stated above. Plaintiffs' 187 motion for sanctions is denied. The Court will schedule a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 06/02/11. (ESL)
December 3, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/3/2009.(NVO)
November 23, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/23/2009.(NVO)
November 16, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/16/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernal et al v. Daewoo Motor America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Bernal
Represented By: Julio Medina Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Bernal
Represented By: Julio Medina Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bernal
Represented By: Julio Medina Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daewoo Motor America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daewoo Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?