Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Madison

Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Sherryl L Madison
Case Number: 2:2009cv01508
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that the "Notice of Lis Pendens" recorded by Defendant with the Maricopa County Recorder on May 1, 2009, is null, void, and of no effect whatsoever. Title to the real property located in Maricopa County, Arizona, and described as Lot 499, Wildflower Ranch Unit IV, shall be forever free and clear of this aforementioned encumbrance. Plaintiff is awarded judgment against Defendant for statutory penalties in the amount of $10,000.00. This is exclusive of an award of reasonable costs and attorney fees. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/12/11. (LSP)
October 5, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/5/10.(LSP)
June 3, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the lis pendens (Maricopa County recording number 20090389815) and the deed of release and reconveyance (Maricopa County recording number 20090390204) are both groundless. The lis pendens is void and of no effect. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/3/10. (LSP)
August 3, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED AS TO CONSOLIDATION PER ORDER OF 8/19/09 12 - CONSOLIDATION ORDER - MEMBER CASE granting 4 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case Consolidated with LEAD Case CV 08-1562 PHX-GMS. Case reassigned to Judge G Murray Snow for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey has been terminated from this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/31/09. (LSP) Modified on 8/19/2009 (DMT, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Shawn Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherryl L Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?