TriQuint Semiconductor, Inc. v. Avago Technologies Limited et al

Plaintiff: TriQuint Semiconductor, Inc.
Defendant: Avago Technologies Limited, Avago Technologies U.S., Inc. and Avago Technologies Wireless IP (Singapore) Pte., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01531
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2012 601 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 591 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Orders of the Court (Doc. 590). All orders previously entered in this matter with the exception of Doc. Nos. 72,73, 87, 90, 127, 128, 14 5, 187, 299, 300, 371, 376, 378, 391, 406, 410, 432, 438, 454, 462, 492, 495, 498, and 571 are hereby vacated. The parties shall jointly file within ten days a list by docket number of all orders to be vacated. The Clerk shall note in the docket that those orders are vacated.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the parties Stipulation of Dismissal withPrejudice (Doc. 591). All claims and counterclaims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs of suit and attorney s fees incurred in connection with this litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying all other pending motions and stipulations as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the final pretrial conference set for June 25,2012 and the trial set to begin on July 10, 2012. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/17/12. (LAD)
April 25, 2012 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting/denying in part 466 Motion for Reconsideration. The motion is granted with respect to Avago's motion for summary judgment on TriQuint's antitrust claims and denied with respect to all other issues. FURTHER ORDERED grant ing 469 Motion for Reconsideration to the extent that it requests clarification. To the extent that the motion requests reconsideration, it is denied. This Order does not change any of the Court's rulings in the Summary Judgment Order dated February 24, 2012 (Doc. 454 ). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/25/12.(MAP)
December 13, 2011 410 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting TriQuint's First Motion to Seal (Doc. 381 ; 370 -Notice). FURTHER ORDERED granting Avago's First Motion to Seal (Doc. 380 ; 365 -Notice). FURTHER ORDERED granting TriQuint's Motion to Seal and Notice of Lodging u nder Seal (Doc. 397 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Avago's Motion to Seal and Notice of Lodging Under Seal (Doc. 400 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Avago's Second Motion to Seal (Doc. 388 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting TriQuint's Secon d Motion to Seal (Doc. 389 ). FURTHER ORDERED that TriQuint's Motion to Seal to Certain Items in its Notice of Errata (Doc. 405 ; Doc. 393 -Notice). FURTHER ORDERED that Avago shall file a Motion to Seal (Doc. 374 ) within five days of th e date of this Order. If Avago does not file a Motion to Seal Doc. 374 within five days of the date of this Order, the Notice of the Motion to Seal (Doc. 373 ) will be denied with prejudice. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/12/11. (MAP)
November 1, 2011 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that TriQuints 383 Motion for Reconsideration is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall refile the Opposition and Reply under seal, consistent with the terms of this Order, within five days of the date of this Order. The Parties shall also refile the redacted public versions of the Opposition and Reply within five days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/31/11. (ESL)
October 18, 2011 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That the motions to seal (Docs. 325 , 326 ; 367 ; 364 ) and supporting documents thereto (Docs. 308 ; 345 ; 303 ; 327 ; 328 ; 335 ; 343 ; 358 ) are granted in part as follows: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. These motions are denied in all other respects. However, the Clerk of the Court shall not strike or unseal any documents relating to these motions at this time because they will be subject to the supplemental motions to seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall supplement th eir motions to seal (Docs. 325 , 326 ; 367 ; 364 ) within 10 days. FURTHER ORDERED denying 332 Motion to Seal the Sealed Lodged Proposed Version of its Reply on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Against TriQuint Semiconductor, Inc. The partie s shall refile an unredacted public version of Triquint's Opposition to Avago's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions (Doc. 324 - sealed; Doc. 322 and Doc. 323 - unsealed) and Avago's Reply on its Motion for Spoliation Sanctions (Doc. 333 - sealed; Doc. 331 - unsealed) within 5 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall strike the redacted versions of these motions currently filed at Doc. 322 , Doc. 323 , and Doc. 331 and the sealed versions of these motions currently filed at Doc. 324 and Doc. 333 (the stricken sealed documents shall remain sealed). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/17/11. (MAP)
March 29, 2011 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that TriQuint's 231 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Trade Secret and Copyright Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 03/29/11. (ESL)
January 12, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Constructions of the Claim, the Court construes the disputed claim terms as set forth in the table. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 01/12/11. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
October 6, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 155 Motion to Seal FURTHER ORDERED Clerk of the Court shall file, under seal, Avagos Sealed Lodged Answer to TriQuints First Amended Complaint, currently lodged at Doc. 156 . FURTHER ORDERED 165 Motion to Seal FURTHER ORDERED Clerk of the Court shall file, under seal,Avagos Sealed Lodged Corrected Answer to TriQuints First Amended Complaint, currently lodged at Doc. 166 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/5/10.(MAP)
August 3, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 33 Motion to Strike is denied; that Pla's Renewed 129 Motion for Leave to Amend is granted. Pla shall file the proposed amended complaint (Doc #129-1, Exhibit A) within 5 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 08/02/10. (ESL)
June 11, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice (to re-filing not under seal) 94 Motion to Amend FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will strike the following sealed documents from this record (the Clerk of the Court shall leave all lodged sealed documents under seal, but shall note in the docket text that they were stricken): Docs. ## 95 , 99 , 106 , 107 , 108 , and 116 ; the motions to seal (Docs. ## 98 , 105 , 115 ) are granted to the extent that these documents shall remain under seal because the Court will not consider them in the resolution of this case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/10/10.(MAP)
June 10, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice to re-filing (within 5 days), unsealed 112 Motion to Strike FURTHER ORDERED The following documents are stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court (the Clerk of the Court shall leave all lodged sealed documents under seal, but shall note in the docket text that they were stricken): Doc. #111, Doc. # 113 , Doc. # 119 , Doc. # 120 , Doc. # 123 , Doc. # 124 . Because these documents have been stricken from the record, the motions to seal (Docs. ## 110 , 118 , 122 ) are granted to the extent that these document shall remain under seal because the Court will not consider them in the resolution of this case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/9/10.(MAP)
March 16, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to Seal FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file, under seal, Defendants Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, currently lodged at 80 FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 51 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Antitrust Counter-Counterclaims, with leave to re-file if necessary once Plaintiff files its amended reply to Defendants amended answer, or if Plaintiff seeks leave to amend its complaint to incorporate its antitrust claims. FINALLY ORDERED vacating oral argument current scheduled for 4/19/10, at 11:00am. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/16/10.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TriQuint Semiconductor, Inc. v. Avago Technologies Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TriQuint Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies Wireless IP (Singapore) Pte., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?