Kent v. Cummings et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Joseph Kent
Defendant: Unknown Cummings, Unknown Groody, Unknown Reilly, Unknown Haggart, Joseph M Arpaio, Unknown MacKentyre and Unknown Griffin
Case Number: 2:2009cv01616
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall promptly make arrangements for Plaintiff to timely view the 6 CDR Memorex CDs and 8 DVDR TDK DVDs produced to Plaintiff on May 24, 2010 and that Defendants sh all file a written notice regarding those arrangements, including the date upon which Plaintiff will be permitted to viewthe materials. If appropriate, Defendants shall also timely produce to Plaintiff hard copies of the information contained on the 6 CDs and 8 DVDs produced on May 24, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/27/10.(LAD)
June 29, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dft's alternative claim for relief in his 58 Motion to Compel; that Dft's 61 Motion to Compel Pla to Complete his Deposition and Request that Pla pay Dft Attorney's Fees and Costs and Aborted Deposition is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 06/28/10. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
June 25, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FROM CHAMBERS of the Honorable John W. Sedwick. The court adopts the 65 Report and Recommendation and base thereon the Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Order Directing ADOC to take specified action is denied. (ESL)
June 24, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 06/24/10.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. Cummings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Joseph Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Groody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Haggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown MacKentyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?