McClurg et al v. Maricopa County et al

Plaintiff: Elijah McClurg and Lucas McClurg
Defendant: Maricopa County, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Joseph Arpaio and Maricopa County Correctional Health Services
Case Number: 2:2009cv01684
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 171 Motion for New Trial, which the Court construes as a motion to alter judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. That Plaintiffs' 169 Motion to Conduct a Daubert Hearing is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/9/12.(DMT)
August 27, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Maricopa County's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 147 Sheriff Joseph Arpaio's Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying Plaintiffs' 155 Request for Rule 56(d) Relief. That the Clerk of Court must terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/27/12.(DMT)
September 23, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Maricopa County and Maricopa County Correctional Health Services' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 97) and Defendants Sheriff Joseph Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Sergeant Malinchalk, Sergeant Patterson, Officer Her nandez, and Officer Hargrove's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 98) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' claims based on violation of the Privileges and Immunities Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment; Plaintiffs' claims based on c ruel and unusual punishment; Plaintiffs' claims based on equal protection; Plaintiffs' claims for vicarious liability/respondeat superior; Plaintiffs' state law claims; and Defendants MCCHS, the MCSO, Malinchalk, Patterson, Hernandez, Hargrove, Barker, and Lamarre are all dismissed from this action. Plaintiffs' claims alleged pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against Maricopa County and Arpaio regarding the conditions of confinement and medical care, as well as, Plaintiffs&# 039; related claims for loss of familial association and the Estates claims for pain and suffering remain. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for completing discovery shall be extended to December 1, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dispositive motions shall be filed no later than January 2, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/22/2011. (KMG)
September 30, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file a First Amended Complaint no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Defendant Arpaio's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings[ 70], which addresses Plaintiffs' original Complaint, is DENIED with leave to refile. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/30/10.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClurg et al v. Maricopa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah McClurg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas McClurg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?