Monsanto v. DWW Partners LLLP et al

Plaintiff: Maxwell Monsanto
Defendant: DWW Partners LLLP, DWW AZ, Inc. and David Wilson Automotive Group
Case Number: 2:2009cv01788
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Defendant DWW AZ, Inc's Motion to Stay the Court's January 15, 2010 Orders Pending Resolution of Appeal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/7/10.(LSP)
February 1, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration. The 6/1/10 arbitration completion date is affirmed. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/1/10.(LAD)
January 15, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Compel arbitration and stay proceedings. The parties shall submit this matter to arbitration pursuant to the terms of the arbitration clause found in both October agreements. This action is stayed until June 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/15/10.(DMT, )
December 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff shall file a response to 19 Defendants' REPLY in Support re 11 MOTION to Compel Binding Arbitration and Stay Proceedings no later than 10 days from the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/1/09. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monsanto v. DWW Partners LLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Monsanto
Represented By: Diane Loretta Bornscheuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWW Partners LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWW AZ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilson Automotive Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?