Brunat et al v. IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B. et al

Plaintiff: Vladimir Brunat and Dagmar Brunat
Defendant: IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 2:2009cv01796
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases/ Reassign Case ; granting 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File notice of Appeal ; denying 66 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Strike the Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/13/11.(DMT)
April 6, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 54 Motion for Hearing. The clerk shall enter final judgment. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/5/11.(LAD)
July 26, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Reconsideration and revising our order to conclude Deutsche Bank's motion to dismiss is denied to the extent that the complaint seeks the remedy of rescission; denying 43 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/23/10.(LAD)
May 26, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft Deutsche Bank's 24 Motion to Dismiss Count 1 of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 05/26/10. (ESL)
August 31, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dfts and their servicers, agents, assigns, employees, officers, attys, and representatives are HEREBY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from engaging in or performing any act to deprive Pla of ownership a nd/or possession of the real property located at 30507 N. 164th St., Scottsdale, Arizona 85262 ("Property"), including but not limited to instituting, prosecuting, or maintaining foreclosure or sale proceedings on the Property, from recordi ng any foreclosure instrument, deeds or mortgages regarding the Property or from otherwise taking any steps whatsoever to deprive Pla of ownership and/or possession in the Property, and in particular from proceeding with the sale of the Property sche duled for 9/1/09. This Temporary Restraining Order is effective immediately. FURTHER ORDERED that this Temporary Restraining Order shall be binding on the parties to this action and all other persons or entities who receive actual notice of this order. FURTHER ORDERED scheduling a telephonic Status Conference for 9/11/2009 at 1:30 PM before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/31/09. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunat et al v. IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Brunat
Represented By: Wayne Dalley Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dagmar Brunat
Represented By: Wayne Dalley Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?