Prestige Administration v. US Fidelis et al

Plaintiff: Prestige Administration
Defendant: US Fidelis and Crescent Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv01804
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10. (LSP)
April 15, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Cory Atkinson's 68 Motion to Dismiss; granting Defendants Darain and Mia Atkinson's 78 Motion to Set Aside 77 Clerk's Entry of Default; Defendants Darain and Mia Atkinson must file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint by 5/7/10. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/10.(REW)
March 26, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant Mepco Finance Corporation's 34 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Pla's 36 Request for leave to amend its complaint is granted. Pla shall file an amended complaint by 4/16/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prestige Administration v. US Fidelis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prestige Administration
Represented By: Kurt Alan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Fidelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?