Tucson Women's Center et al

Plaintiff: Tucson Women's Center, Family Planning Associates, William H. Richardson, M.D., Paul A. Isaacson, M.D. and Frank Laudonio, M.D.
Defendant: Arizona Medical Board, Lisa Wynn and Terry Goddard
Case Number: 2:2009cv01909
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/15/2010.(NVO)
November 24, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Intervene. CPC and ACC shall file their answer as intervenor-defendants in this action on or before 12/11/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/24/2009.(NVO)
September 30, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CERTIFYING QUESTION TO THE ARIZONA SUPREME COURT - IT IS ORDERED:1. The following question is certified to the Arizona Supreme Court pursuant toA.R.S. § 12-1861 and Rule 27 of the Rules of the Arizona Supreme Court: Whether the payment pro vision of A.R.S. § 36-2153(D) applies only when the informed consent and 24-hour waiting period of A.R.S. § 36-2153(A) is triggered by the actual providing or inducing of an abortion, or whether it applies outside the abortion context whene ver an inquiry about abortion is made to a health care provider. 2. The Clerk is directed to file with the Arizona Supreme Court the original and six copies of this certification order. The Clerk shall transmit to the Arizona Supreme Court the original or copies of such other portions of the Court's record as the Arizona Supreme Court may deem necessary to a determination of the certified question. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/30/09. (SAT)
September 29, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 5 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/29/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucson Women's Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson Women's Center
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Planning Associates
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Richardson, M.D.
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Isaacson, M.D.
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Laudonio, M.D.
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?