v. Arpaio et al

Defendant: Joseph Arpaio, Ava Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Maricopa County Attorney's Office
Case Number: 2:2009cv01912
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 124 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 Regarding Evidence of Prosecutorial Support of Charging Decision is DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/4/12. (NKS)
December 23, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that "Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment" Doc. 92 is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' equal protection claim and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/23/2011.(KMG)
August 23, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Sheriff Arpaios 86 Motion In Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert D.P. Van Blaricom From Providing Testimony or Other Evidence is DENIED with respect to paragraphs 8a-8c and 8e of Mr. Van Blaricom's expert report and GRANTED in all other respects. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/22/11. (NKS)
February 10, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, except that Plaintiffs' state law claims for abuse of process and false arrest are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs are given leave until February 26, 2010, to amend their complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against the Maricopa County Sheriff's Office are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jural status. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/10/10. (DTN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Represented By: Scott H Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Arpaio
Represented By: Scott H Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Scott H Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?