Payan et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Plaintiff: Martha E Payan and Xavier Payan
Defendant: Phoenix, City of, Phoenix Police Department, City of, Joshua R Mesquita, Timothy M Wheeler, Eric S Gunnels, Chad Brouwer, Nathan Jordan, Janina Austin and Joseph Congero
Case Number: 2:2009cv01917
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, granted in part with respect to dismissal Plaintiffs' state law claims and with respect to the dismissal of Defendants Nathan Jordan and Joseph Congero from this action. It is denied with respect to Plaintiff Xavier Payan's Section 1983 claim for violation of the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments by Defendants Eric S. Gunnels, Chad Brouwer and Janina Austin. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/4/10.(LSP)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - that for purposes of considering the motion to dismiss 47 filed by Austin, Brouwer, Congero, Gunnels, and Jordan, the Court will consider only the claims and allegations preserved in the Amended Complaint 25 . If Plaintiffs wish to proceed on claims or allegations from the original complaint, Plaintiffs must file a motion to amend and, consistent with Local Rule Civil 15.1 attach the proposed amended complaint. Again, this proposed amended complaint must not incorporate by reference any of the prior complaints. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/10/10. (KMG)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss Pla's Amended Complaint as to dfts City of Phoenix and Phoenix Police Department. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/4/10.(LAD)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the motion to amend Doc. # 11 is granted; Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by December 22, 2009 or this case will be dismissed. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by January 13, 2010. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss Doc. # 9 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/11/09.(KMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payan et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha E Payan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Payan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua R Mesquita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S Gunnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Brouwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janina Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Congero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?