Miller et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michelle Miller and Nathan Miller
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv01954
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion (Doc. 96) to Request Publication of this court's Order of December 2, 2010 (doc. 95). The clerk is instructed to email a copy of doc. 95 marked "For Print Publication" to West at "ardistct@westdcs.west.thomson.com", and to Lexis at "Source.Acquisition@lexisnexis.com". Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/4/11.(KMG)
December 3, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment re bad faith and punitive damages claims and denying defendant's cross-motion on the breach of contract claim 66 ; denying plaintiff's 34 Motion to Certify Class; granting 35 plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the unenforceability of the Policy's medical payments offset provision. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/2/10.(TLJ)
July 23, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART plaintiffsmotion to amend (doc. 32). The motion is granted to the extent that it seeks to assert claims against American Standard. The motion is denied to the extent that it seeks to assert a claim for injunctive relief and to expand the class definition. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING defendants motion to limit plaintiffs standing to assert claims on behalf of American Standard insureds only (doc. 44). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (doc. 71). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/23/10.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David D Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?